SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
UNDER
THE SECURITIES ACT OF 1933
|
Nevada
(State or Other Jurisdiction of
Incorporation or Organization) |
| |
95-1480559
(I.R.S. Employer
Identification Number) |
|
Pennsauken, NJ 08109-4613
(856) 356-4500
Chief Financial Officer
RCM Technologies, Inc.
2500 McClellan Avenue, Suite 350
Pennsauken, NJ 08109-4613
(856) 356-4500
|
Justin W. Chairman, Esquire
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP 2222 Market Street Philadelphia, PA 19103 (215) 963-5000 |
|
|
Large accelerated filer ☐
|
| |
Accelerated filer ☒
|
| |
Non-accelerated filer ☐
|
| |
Smaller reporting company ☒
|
|
| | | | | | | | | |
Emerging growth company ☐
|
|
| | | | | 1 | | | |
| | | | | 2 | | | |
| | | | | 3 | | | |
| | | | | 3 | | | |
| | | | | 4 | | | |
| | | | | 4 | | | |
| | | | | 7 | | | |
| | | | | 8 | | | |
| | | | | 10 | | | |
| | | | | 10 | | | |
| | | | | 13 | | | |
| | | | | 13 | | | |
| | | | | 13 | | | |
| | | | | 13 | | | |
| | | | | 14 | | |
Preferred Stock
Warrants
Rights to Purchase Common Stock, Preferred Stock or Units
Units
| | | | | S-ii | | | |
| | | | | S-1 | | | |
| | | | | S-4 | | | |
| | | | | S-6 | | | |
| | | | | S-7 | | | |
| | | | | S-9 | | | |
| | | | | S-9 | | | |
| | | | | S-10 | | | |
| | | | | S-10 | | |
| | | | | 1 | | | |
| | | | | 2 | | | |
| | | | | 3 | | | |
| | | | | 3 | | | |
| | | | | 4 | | | |
| | | | | 4 | | | |
| | | | | 7 | | | |
| | | | | 8 | | | |
| | | | | 10 | | | |
| | | | | 10 | | | |
| | | | | 13 | | | |
| | | | | 13 | | | |
| | | | | 13 | | | |
| | | | | 13 | | | |
| | | | | 14 | | |
2500 McClellan Avenue, Suite 350
Pennsauken, NJ 08109
United States of America
Attn: Chief Financial Officer
|
SEC registration fee
|
| | | $ | 14,760(1) | | |
|
Legal fees and expenses
|
| | |
|
(2)
|
| |
|
Accounting fees and expenses
|
| | |
|
(2)
|
| |
|
Transfer agent and registrar fees and expenses
|
| | |
|
(2)
|
| |
|
Stock exchange listing fees
|
| | |
|
(2)
|
| |
|
Printing, FINRA filing fee (if applicable) and miscellaneous expenses
|
| | |
|
(2)
|
| |
|
Total
|
| | |
|
(2)
|
| |
|
Exhibit
Number |
| |
Document
|
|
| 1.1* | | | Form of Underwriting Agreement. | |
| 3.1 | | | Articles of Incorporation, as amended; incorporated by reference to Exhibit 3(a) to the Registrant’s Annual Report on Form 10-K for the fiscal year ended October 31, 1994, filed with the Securities and Exchange Commission on January 4, 1995. | |
| 3.2 | | | Certificate of Amendment of Articles of Incorporation; incorporated by reference to Exhibit A to the Registrant’s Proxy Statement, dated February 6, 1996, filed with the Securities and Exchange Commission on January 29, 1996. | |
| 3.3 | | | Certificate of Amendment of Articles of Incorporation; incorporated by reference to Exhibit B to the Registrant’s Proxy Statement, dated February 6, 1996, filed with the Securities and Exchange Commission on January 29, 1996. | |
| 3.4 | | | Certificate of Amendment of Articles of Incorporation, dated March 27, 2024 (filed herewith) | |
| 3.5 | | | Amended and Restated Bylaws; incorporated by reference to Exhibit 3.1 to the Registrant’s Current Report on Form 8-K filed with the Securities and Exchange Commission on January 23, 2014. | |
| 4.2* | | | Form of Preferred Stock Certificate. | |
| 4.3* | | | Form of Certificate of Designation of Preferred Stock. | |
| 4.4* | | | Form of Warrant Agreement. | |
| 4.5* | | | Form of Warrant Certificate. | |
| 4.6* | | | Form of Rights Certificate. | |
| 4.7* | | | Form of Unit Agreement. | |
| 4.8* | | | Form of Unit Certificate. | |
| 5.1 | | | | |
| 23.1 | | | | |
| 23.2 | | | | |
| 24.1 | | | |
| | | | RCM TECHNOLOGIES, INC. | |
| | | |
By:
/s/ Bradley S. Vizi
Bradley S. Vizi
Executive Chairman and President |
|
|
Signature
|
| |
Title
|
| |
Date
|
|
|
/s/ Bradley S. Vizi
Bradley S. Vizi
|
| |
Executive Chairman, President and Director
(Principal Executive Officer) |
| |
March 29, 2024
|
|
|
/s/ Kevin D. Miller
Kevin D. Miller
|
| |
Chief Financial Officer, Treasurer and Secretary
(Principal Financial and Accounting Officer) |
| |
March 29, 2024
|
|
|
/s/ Chigozie O. Amadi
Chigozie O. Amadi
|
| | Director | | |
March 29, 2024
|
|
|
/s/ Swarna Srinivas Kakodkar
Swarna Srinivas Kakodkar
|
| | Director | | |
March 29, 2024
|
|
|
/s/ Jayanth S. Komarneni
Jayanth S. Komarneni
|
| | Director | | |
March 29, 2024
|
|